Multiplication of a number consisting of only ones with another number becomes very easy using **Vedic Maths** techniques. You must see the earlier post on shortcut for multiplying a number by 11

**MULTIPLYING A NUMBER BY 111**

To multiply a two-digit number by 111, add the two digits and if the sum is a single digit, write this digit TWO TIMES in between the original digits of the number. Some examples:

36×111= 3996

54×111= 5994

The same idea works if the sum of the two digits is not a single digit, but you should write down the last digit of the sum twice, but remember to carry if needed. So

57×111= 6327

because 5+7=12, but then you have to carry the one twice.

For 3 digit numbers

Carry if any of these sums is more than one digit.

Thus 123×111 = 1 | 3 (=1+2) | 6 (=1+2+3) | 5 (=2+3) | 3

Similarly,

241×111 = 26751

For an example where carrying is needed

Say, 352×111=3 | 8 (=3+5) | 10 (=3+5+2)| 7 (=5+2)| 2

= 3 | 8 | 10 | 7 | 2 = 3 | 9 | 0 | 7 | 2

= 39072

(Because of the carries, it may be easier to do the sums and write the answer down from right to left.)

Let me know, if you liked this **Vedic Maths** trick.

## Recent Comments