Quicker Maths

## Finding Square of Number Ending in 5

Posted on June 16, 2013

This is the most common, yet very interesting trick of Vedic Maths.  Using this technique you can find the square of any number ending in 5 very easily.  Given below is the step by step explanation of this squaring technique.

Let us take a 2 digit number ending in 5,

452

We'll get our answer in 2 parts. The right hand side of the answer will always be 25. The left hand side will be the number other than 5, multiplied by it's successor (next higher integer).

= 4  x  (4+1) | 25

= 4 x 5 | 25

## Multiplying Two Numbers when Sum of their Unit Digits is 10

Posted on May 19, 2013

Vedic Multiplication Trick

This method of multiplication from Vedic Maths will make it very easy to multiply two numbers when sum of the last digits is 10 and previous parts are the same. For example multiplications like

23x27 :  Sum of Unit digits i.e. 3+7 = 10; Remaining number i.e. 2 is same in both numbers

46x44:  Sum of Unit digits i.e. 6+4 = 10; Remaining number i.e. 4 is same in both numbers

112x118:  Sum of Unit digits i.e. 2+8 = 10; Remaining number i.e. 11 is same in both numbers

291x299:  Sum of Unit digits i.e. 1+9 = 10; Remaining number i.e. 29 is same in both numbers

135x135:  Sum of Unit digits i.e. 5+5 = 10; Remaining number i.e. 13 is same in both numbers

## How to convert recurring decimal to fraction?

Posted on October 4, 2012

We need to deal with recurring or repeating decimals in school, in our competitive exams and even later.  Today we’ll discuss a shortcut trick to convert recurring decimals to fractions. However, to understand it’s effectiveness, we need to first understand the method taught in schools.

Just follow the steps below carefully. Say you need to find the value of 0.44444……

Step 1: Let x be the value of the repeating decimal which you are converting to fraction
x = 0.44444444…

We know the repeating digit is 4

Step 2: Multiply x by a power of 10, such that the resultant has same repeating digits on the right side of decimal. In this case if we multiply 10 both side, we get –

## Quick Multiplication by 5

Posted on May 21, 2012

Tricks for fast calculation by 5

It is a simple trick which is very intuitive and easy to understand. Many QuickerMaths.com followers might find it very simple. However, there are many who will enjoy this simple yet readily usable trick to multiply any number by five.

1. Multiplying 5 times an even number: halve the number you are multiplying by and place a zero after the number.

Example:

i. 5 * 136, half of 136 is 68, add a zero for an answer of 680.

ii. 5 * 874, half of 874 is 437; add a zero for an answer of 4370.

## Find Value of Sin and Cos using Fingers

Posted on March 25, 2012

Today I am going to share with you a special memory trick for trigonometry, mailed to me by Debasis Basak – a young Class IX follower of QuickerMaths.com

By this method we can find out Sines and Cosines of different angles. It just requires your hand. Let’s understand this trick step by step -

Step 1

First mark the angles of 0, 30, 45, 60, and 90 on little, ring, middle and pointer finger and thumb of your left hand.

Step 2

On the palm of your left hand write the equation (x)^1/2 /2 or  square root of x/2

## Ratio of Area and Volume

Posted on February 28, 2012

Finding the ratio of areas or volumes given the length of a side of a 2 or 3 dimensional figure was always a time consuming task. With the help of the knowledge you are going to acquire now, this will be a simple and quick task.

In any two dimensional figure, if the corresponding sides are in the ratio a:b, then their areas are in the ratio a2:b2

Two dimensional figures can be any polygon like square, rectangle, rhombus, trapezium, hexagon, etc. It can also be a triangle or a circle. The sides, referred in the statement above, can be length, breadth or even diagonal in case of a polygon. In case of a circle the sides will be represented by radius or diameter or circumference. In triangle it can be sides or height of a triangle.

## No More Carrying Over

Posted on January 20, 2012

"Carry" in Addition - Can it be Avoided?

Carrying over is a concept taught to us at a very early stage of our life. However, it has never been an easy thing to do. In adding two or more numbers, most of us face problem while “carrying over”. Larger the digits, involved in the numbers to be added, more likely it is to involve carrying.   More the carrying over involved, more likely are we to make mistakes.

Friends, remember the most basic and effective rule of making arithmetic fast and quick is to break difficult calculations into simpler, easily manageable small calculations.

Any digit when added to 9 (except 0) makes carrying over mandatory.  On the contrary, anything added to 0 can’t produce a two digit number.  Even if 9 is added to 0, no carrying is needed.

## Trick for Adding Time

Posted on November 9, 2011

Have you ever faced any problem in adding time?

If you have ever have faced the slightest difficulty in adding time or duration expressed in hours and minutes, this trick is meant for you.

Say you have to add 4 hours 55 minutes and 2 hours 40 minutes.

Make 4 hours 55 minutes into one number, which will give us 455 and do the same for the other number, 2 hours 40 minutes, giving us 240.

Shortcut Trick to Add Two Numbers

## Base Method of Multiplication

Posted on October 12, 2011

Base method of multiplication derived from Vedic Mathematics can be applied for multiplication of two numbers close to 100.

This post in is in continuation of an earlier post named "Vedic Multiplication of two numbers close to hundred". Though you can understand this post stand alone, yet I'll recommend you to read the linked post before reading this one.

In this post I'll explain how to multiply two numbers lesser than the base (in this case 100). In the earlier post it was about both numbers more than 100.

## Simplify Multiplication with the Lattice Method

Posted on September 16, 2011

## Simplify Multiplication using Lattice Method

Multiplication tables are a pillar of growing up no matter where you are in the world. Spending most of fourth grade learning how to multiply up to 12 x 12 was a fun and exciting time, but I was never a fan of how long it took to multiply larger numbers. I didn’t learned the lattice method until later but as a fan of matrices in calculus, this alternative method of multiplication appealed to me. Here’s how it works: