Vedic Multiplication Trick for 2 Numbers Starting with Same Digits

Multiplication Method – multiplying 2 numbers starting with same digit(s)

This vedic maths trick will help you in multiplying two numbers when these numbers start with the same digit. For example 34 x 37; see their ten’s digit (starting digit) is same. Another example can be 234 x 232, see their hundred’s and ten’s digits (starting two digits) are same.

In one of the earlier post a similar method was described. In that like this trick the starting digit(s) should be same but at the same time the sum of digit at unit’s place should be 10 – please check that out – Vedic multiplication

Learn Multiplication

34 x 37

To multiply 34×37, we know they are in the base 30. Hence the reference point (base) will be 30.

Step 1.

Determine how much more is 34 from 30. The answer is 4

Determine how much more is 37 from 30. The answer is 7

Step 2.

Either add 4 to 37 = 41 or 7 to 34 = 41.

The result will be same always.

Step 3.

Multiply the resultant number from step 2 by the base, which is in this case 30

41×30 = 41x3x10 = 123×10 = 1230

Step 4.

Add to the resultant of step 3 the product of the numbers obtained from step 1. This will give you the answer.

1230+ (4×7) = 1230 + 28 = 1258

Another example,

23 x 29

From step 1 and step 2 above, 23 + 9 = 32 or 29 + 3 = 32

From step 3 : 32 x 20 = 640

From step 4 : 640 + (3×9) = 667

One more example,

234 x 232

From step 1 and step 2 above, 234 +2 = 236 or 232 + 4 = 236

From step 3 : 236 x 230 = 54280

From step 4 : 54280 + (4×2) = 54288

using the above method can also be used for multiplying two numbers close to humdred Vineet Patawari

Hi, I'm Vineet Patawari. I fell in love with numbers after being scared of them for quite some time. Now, I'm here to make you feel comfortable with numbers and help you get rid of Math Phobia!

22 thoughts to “Vedic Multiplication Trick for 2 Numbers Starting with Same Digits”

1. GuanYung says:

Nice trick !
Is there any vedic method to calculate multiplication o f2 numbers with different base ? For example : 47*34 = ?

2. prasanna says:

i want some division sums please.

3. angelina says:

i want some extra sums dude. its so helpful.

4. abhishek burnwal says:

awesome tricks dude .can you send me more tips and tricks to my mail

5. abhishek burnwal says:

awesome tricks dude can you send me more tips and tricks

6. Mansoor Ahmed TA says:

very easy trick for 294*296, here we will use the base method, here last digit adds to 10
and the first two digits are same 29
first step: 29*30(by adding just one to twenty nine) = 870
second step:4*6 last digits

7. Mansoor Ahmed TA says:

very easy trick
34*37=(33*37)+37 or (34*36)+36 by taking base total 10 method
hence the tens digit both are 3 the same.
so firstly we will do 3*4(by adding just one to three)
that is 12
second stept 3*7=21
so 33*37=1221
34*37=1221+37
=1258

1. Vilas Thakur says:

34 x 37 = 3 x ( 34 + 7 ) ( 4 x 7 ) = 3 x 41 (28 ) = 123( 28 ) =( 123+2 ) 8 = 1258 .The simple way of calculation of multiplication by Vedic Maths !

8. s.hossain says:

short cut methods solving : 15³×9³-1555²,14³×8³-1115²,55³×6³-26000²

9. s.hossain says:

short cut methods FOR SOLVING : 15³×9³-1555²,14³×8³-1115²,55³×6³-26000²

10. Gaurav Semwal says:

296*294=??

1. Vineet Patawari says:

296*294
= (296-6)*3 | 4*6
= 87024

1. GOLDY SHARMA says:

explain

2. Vilas Thakur says:

296*294 = (296 – 004 ) (294 – 006 ) = 3 ( 296 – 006 ) / ( 4 x 6 ) = 87024 . It’s very easy and Nice Trick !!

11. arif says:

this is a usful mathematical tick for students.thanks for your eamil

12. suryansh says:

excelent work dude

13. subhendu says:

you r doing very good work.

14. kamal teja says:

thank u for giving this trick

15. vrishali says:

is there any shortcut for multiplying and dividing any 3 digit no. with another 3 digit no.?

1. ashwani ruhela says:

please dont think of shortcuts too much. a good practice to do them in the traditional way. the shortcut of everything is only Practice Practice and Practice. best of luck !

16. DEEPIKA says:

thanx
dis trick is 2 good
n applicable 2 in various Questions
plg do share more tricks sirji

17. prashanth ram says:

Great Formulas……….thanks for sharing such gems for us