Comments on: Vedic Multiplication Trick http://www.quickermaths.com/learn-multiplication/ Mathematics Tricks and Tips Wed, 10 Aug 2016 04:38:46 +0000 hourly 1 By: GuanYunghttp://www.quickermaths.com/learn-multiplication/comment-page-1/#comment-22936 Tue, 25 Nov 2014 09:00:42 +0000 http://www.quickermaths.com/?p=2268#comment-22936 Nice trick !
Is there any vedic method to calculate multiplication o f2 numbers with different base ? For example : 47*34 = ?

]]>
By: Vilas Thakurhttp://www.quickermaths.com/learn-multiplication/comment-page-1/#comment-14393 Wed, 20 Jun 2012 13:37:54 +0000 http://www.quickermaths.com/?p=2268#comment-14393 296*294 = (296 – 004 ) (294 – 006 ) = 3 ( 296 – 006 ) / ( 4 x 6 ) = 87024 . It’s very easy and Nice Trick !!

]]>
By: Vilas Thakurhttp://www.quickermaths.com/learn-multiplication/comment-page-1/#comment-14202 Sat, 09 Jun 2012 11:38:00 +0000 http://www.quickermaths.com/?p=2268#comment-14202 34 x 37 = 3 x ( 34 + 7 ) ( 4 x 7 ) = 3 x 41 (28 ) = 123( 28 ) =( 123+2 ) 8 = 1258 .The simple way of calculation of multiplication by Vedic Maths !

]]>
By: prasannahttp://www.quickermaths.com/learn-multiplication/comment-page-1/#comment-13866 Sun, 27 May 2012 08:42:19 +0000 http://www.quickermaths.com/?p=2268#comment-13866 i want some division sums please.

]]>
By: angelinahttp://www.quickermaths.com/learn-multiplication/comment-page-1/#comment-13865 Sun, 27 May 2012 08:38:34 +0000 http://www.quickermaths.com/?p=2268#comment-13865 i want some extra sums dude. its so helpful.

]]>
By: abhishek burnwalhttp://www.quickermaths.com/learn-multiplication/comment-page-1/#comment-13541 Sat, 28 Apr 2012 09:51:05 +0000 http://www.quickermaths.com/?p=2268#comment-13541 awesome tricks dude .can you send me more tips and tricks to my mail

]]>
By: abhishek burnwalhttp://www.quickermaths.com/learn-multiplication/comment-page-1/#comment-13540 Sat, 28 Apr 2012 09:50:13 +0000 http://www.quickermaths.com/?p=2268#comment-13540 awesome tricks dude can you send me more tips and tricks

]]>
By: Mansoor Ahmed TAhttp://www.quickermaths.com/learn-multiplication/comment-page-1/#comment-13249 Sun, 08 Apr 2012 14:33:30 +0000 http://www.quickermaths.com/?p=2268#comment-13249 very easy trick for 294*296, here we will use the base method, here last digit adds to 10
and the first two digits are same 29
first step: 29*30(by adding just one to twenty nine) = 870
second step:4*6 last digits
and the answer is 87024

]]>
By: Mansoor Ahmed TAhttp://www.quickermaths.com/learn-multiplication/comment-page-1/#comment-13248 Sun, 08 Apr 2012 14:25:09 +0000 http://www.quickermaths.com/?p=2268#comment-13248 very easy trick
34*37=(33*37)+37 or (34*36)+36 by taking base total 10 method
hence the tens digit both are 3 the same.
so firstly we will do 3*4(by adding just one to three)
that is 12
second stept 3*7=21
so 33*37=1221
34*37=1221+37
=1258

]]>
By: GOLDY SHARMAhttp://www.quickermaths.com/learn-multiplication/comment-page-1/#comment-10769 Fri, 30 Dec 2011 14:08:41 +0000 http://www.quickermaths.com/?p=2268#comment-10769 explain

]]>