# Multiplication Trick for Multiples of 11

If you know how to quickly multiply any number by 11 (click on the link to read further), the short cut multiplication method for 22, 33, etc. becomes easy to grasp. It’s an extension to the earlier method and you’ve seen earlier that there is no need to remember multiplication tables.

Multiplication by 11 is easy. Start from the right, add the two adjacent digits and keep on moving left. Since you can write only one digit in each step, if there is a carryover add it to the number obtained in the next step. So let’s begin to learn multiplication by multiples of 11.

**Multiplication Trick for 22**

*For multiplication with 22, the rule is (number +next number)*2*

Let us look at it step by step –

**Step 1: **For sake of simplicity, assume that there are two invisible 0 (zeroes) on both ends of the given number.

Say if the number is **786, **assume it to be** 0 7 8 6 0**

**Step 2:**Start from the right, add the two adjacent digits and multiply by 2. Keep on moving left.

07860

Add the last zero to the digit in the ones column (6), and multiply by 2. Write the answer below the ones column.

Then add this 6 with digit on the left i.e. 8 and multiply by 2.

Next add 8 with 7 and multiply with 2.

Next add 7 with 0 and multiply by 2.

(0+7)*2 | (7+8)*2 | (8+6)*2 | (6+0)*2

= 14 | 30 | 28 | 12

**Step 3: **Start from right most digit. Keep only the unit’s digit. Carryover and add the ten’s digit to the next number to the left. Doing this we get the answer as 17292.

Yes, job done. Quite simple, isn’t it?

**Multiplication with Other Multiples Of 11**

For multiplication with 33, the rule is (number +next number)*3

For multiplication with 44, the rule is (number +next number)*4

and so on….till

For multiplication with 99, the rule is (number +next number)*9. However, their is a simpler way of multiplication trick for 99

**Multiplication Examples:**

56789*22 = 0567890*22= (0+5)*2 | (5+6)*2 | (6+7)*2 | (7+8)*2 | (8+9)*2 | (9+0)*2=1249358

123678*88 = 01236780*88 = (0+1)*8 | (1+2)*8 | (2+3)*8 | (3+6)*8 | (6+7)*8 | (7+8)*8 | (8+0)*8=10883664

Try it yourself. Share your experience with all by posting a comment below.

252 1774297

could u please explain d multiplication 123678*88

(0+1)*8|(1+2)*8|(2+3)*8|(3+6)*8|(6+7)*8|(7+8)*8|(8+0)*8

=

8|24|40|72|104|120|64

=

10883664