# Speed Multiplication by 111 : Vedic Maths

Multiplication of a number consisting of only ones with another number becomes very easy using Vedic Maths techniques. You must see the earlier post on shortcut for multiplying a number by 11

MULTIPLYING A NUMBER BY 111
To multiply a two-digit number by 111, add the two digits and if the sum is a single digit, write this digit TWO TIMES in between the original digits of the number. Some examples:

36×111= 3996
54×111= 5994

The same idea works if the sum of the two digits is not a single digit, but you should write down the last digit of the sum twice, but remember to carry if needed. So

57×111= 6327
because 5+7=12, but then you have to carry the one twice.

For 3 digit numbers
Carry if any of these sums is more than one digit.
Thus 123×111 = 1 | 3 (=1+2) | 6 (=1+2+3) | 5 (=2+3) | 3

Similarly,
241×111 = 26751

For an example where carrying is needed

Say, 352×111=3 | 8 (=3+5) | 10 (=3+5+2)| 7 (=5+2)| 2
= 3 | 8 | 10 | 7 | 2 = 3 | 9 | 0 | 7 | 2
= 39072

(Because of the carries, it may be easier to do the sums and write the answer down from right to left.)

Let me know, if you liked this Vedic Maths trick.

#### Vineet Patawari

Hi, I'm Vineet Patawari. I fell in love with numbers after being scared of them for quite some time. Now, I'm here to make you feel comfortable with numbers and help you get rid of Math Phobia!

## 16 thoughts to “Speed Multiplication by 111 : Vedic Maths”

1. Prashant Jondhale says:

3 of them are awesome..nice i lyk it

2. Mousam Khatri says:

really it is good

3. Mousam Khatri says:

really it is to good.

4. siri says:

i likd these tricks,its veryuseful for cmptitiv xams and also fr smrt wrk

5. pintu says:

great job………………………. enjoyed knowing tricks thanks a lot

6. santhosh says:

its good keka

7. vidyasagar says:

hi Gud Mrg Frnds……….. i like this type of tricks…….

8. Deep Mukherjee says:

I think first multiplyling by 999 and then dividing with 9 will take less time.
Ex. 123*111= 123*999/9= 122877/9=13653. And in this process we can multiply with 1111 or 11111 or 222 or 4444 or the like.
And the process to multiply with 999 or the like,
Process 1:
If number of 9 is equal to or greater than the number of digits to be multiplied:
3154*9999=
first we have to substract 1 from the very number & write down it from the left. Here, 3154-1=3153.
Now we substract it from 9999. Here, 9999-3153=6846. & write it to the write of 3153. It is the answer required. 3154*9999= 31536846.
3154*99999=315396846.
Process 2:
If the number of nine is less than the digit of the number:
456*99=
first we leave the number equal to number of 9 from right side. Here no of 9 is 2, so we leave 56. Now we add 1 with the remaining number and substract it from original one. Here, 4+1=5, 456-5=451. Now we write it to the left side. Next, we substract the digit we kept aside (here 56) from the number more than 1 of the multiplicator ( i.e, (99+1)-56=44) and write it to the right. Therefore, 456*99=45144.
Ex 2. 526*9
6 kept aside. (52+1)=53, (526-53)=473, now ((9+1)-6)=4,
therefore, 526*9=4734

1. siri says:

yah its nice yaaa

2. Yogesh says:

Its a very nice method but what to do when to multiply by 2222 or 444 as mentioned

9. Deep Mukherjee says:

I think first multiplyling by 999 and then dividing with 9 will take less time.
Ex. 123*111= 123*999/9= 122877/9=13653. And in this process we can multiply with 1111 or 11111 or more.

10. shikha anand says:

i really liked the trick.it was worth learning nd above all “vedic mathematics” is what the world dies for.