Vedic Multiplication of two numbers close to Hundred

Vedic Method of Multiplication: Base System of multiplication

Application: Multiplication of two numbers close to Hundred

Case 1: Both numbers greater than 100.

Rule: You will get the answer in two parts

First part, to get left hand side of the answer: Add the difference between 100 and either of the numbers to the other number

Second part, to get right hand side of the answer: multiply the difference from 100 of both the numbers

Example

103 x 104 = 10712

The answer is in two parts: 107 and 12,

107 is just 103 + 4 (or 104 + 3), and 12 is just 3 x 4.

Similarly 107 x 106 = 11342

107 + 6 = 113 and 7 x 6 = 42

123 x 103 = 12669

(123 + 3) | (23 x 3) = 126 | 69 =12669 .

If the multiplication of the offsets is more than 100 then this method won’t work. For example 123 x 105. Here offsets are 23 and 5.

Multiplication of 23 and 5 is 115 which are more than 100. So this method won’t work.

But it can still work with a little modification. Consider the following examples:

Example 1

122 x 123 = 15006

Step 1: 22 x 23 = 506 (as done earlier)

Step 2: 122 + 23 (as done earlier)

Step 3: Add the 5 (digit at 100s place) of 506 to step 2

Answer: (122 + 23 + 5) | (22 x 23) = 150 | 06 = 10506

Example 2

123 x 105 (Different representation but same method)

123 + 5 = 128

23 x 5 = 115

128 | 115

= 12915

In the next post I’ll tell you about vedic multiplication, i.e.,  how to multiply two numbers lesser than the base (in this case 100).

Here’s the promised post for you – http://www.quickermaths.com/base-method-of-multiplication/ Vineet Patawari

Hi, I'm Vineet Patawari. I fell in love with numbers after being scared of them for quite some time. Now, I'm here to make you feel comfortable with numbers and help you get rid of Math Phobia!

23 thoughts to “Vedic Multiplication of two numbers close to Hundred”

1. Parijat Kapoor says:

Dear Sir ,

Thank you for explaining such fundamental concepts so simply. I am preparing for SSC exams and did not have a mathematical background. I find such knowledge valuable.

Looking forward to more of your posts!

2. Ajit mane says:

Thank you sir!!!

3. Mental Maths Tricks says:

Thanks, I have just been looking for info approximately this subject for ages and yours is the greatest I have found out till now. However, what concerning the bottom line? Are you positive about the supply?

4. VINAY ARORA says:

TO FIND THE SQUARE OF BIGGER NUMBERS LIKE 923, 916, 927 BY SHORT CUT METHOD ……………. SQUARE OF 923= SEE THE LAST TWO DIGITS OF THIS NUMBER WHICH ARE 23, SO ADD AND SUBTRACT 23 FROM THIS NO WE GET 946 & 900 . NOW MULTIPLY 900 AND 946= 851400. NOW ADD THIS SQUARE OF 23 THAT IS 529 . SO FINALLY OUR ANSWER IS = 851400+529= 851929 …..

LIKE WISE WE CAN FIND THE SQUARE OF ANY BIGGER NO BY THIS SHORT CUT METHOD . VINAY ARORA .

1. Sunny Nair says:

“NOW MULTIPLY 900 AND 946” that’s as laborious as 923 x 923 which is not the point of Vedic mathematical short cuts your solution is not a shortcut unless you explain further.

5. VINAY ARORA says:

A REDUCTION OF 20% IN THE PRICE OF A PEN ENABLES A CUSTOMER TO PURCHASE 12 MORE PENS FOR RUPEES 15 . WHAT IS THE ORIGNAL PRICE OF 16 PENS BEFORE REDUCTION ? .

6. shilpi says:

1. Sandeep says:

Thanks

7. Lalit says:

It applies only for the numbers between 100 to 200.Whats for the numbers greater than 200.

8. sandy says:

how this trick works for 169 x 179 .please mention steps in explaination. and also the scope of trick. Thanks

1. Shraman N L says:

Very Simple: 169*179 = (170-1)x(180-1)= 170×180-(169+179+1)=30251 Ans ?????? ???? ?? ????? ??? ????? ?????? ?? ?? ????? ???? ??? ???

2. knn mayya says:

Average of 169 and 179 =174 and its square= 174^2= 30276 deduct 5*5 =25 { diff of 169 &174 and 179&174) 30276-21 =30251 so, 169*179 =30251

9. pallavi says:

Dear Sir,

I am very weak in Maths but I will keep learning short tricks from your site so that one day I would be able to clear the entrance Exams.
Thanks. May God bless you.

Regards
Pallavi

1. admin says:

Thanks Pallavi for your kind words. Keeping coming back & get hold of some good books, those will help you a lot in your preparation.

10. M JEYAKODI says:

your shortcut multiplication and squares numbers are very useful to my bank exam thank you very much please send ur lot of shortcuts

11. dilip says:

very nice, this will help a lot to persons interested in Maths at any age.

12. Pingback: Vedic Maths Course
13. alisha says:

nice trick
prolong wid more tricks

14. nitin says:

its wonderful…………
keep posting more of these

15. hunny d... he@rt h!@ckr says:

amazing dude it’s really working…….v

16. mady_rock says:

superb work man……
keep it up…