# Multiply 2 numbers, sum of whose unit places is 10

Vedic Multiplication: This method of multiplication which is from Vedic Maths will make it very easy to multiply two numbers when sum of the last digits is 10 and previous parts are the same

You will get the answer in two parts.

First part, to get left hand side of the answer: multiply the left most digit(s) by its successor

Second part, to get right hand side of the answer: multiply the right most digits of both the numbers.

Example

First part: 4 x (4+1)

Second part: (4 x 6)

Combined effect:  (4 x 5)  | (4 x 6) = 2024

*| is just a separator. Left hand side denotes tens place, right hand side denotes units place

More Examples

37 x 33 = (3 x (3+1)) |  (7 x 3) = (3 x 4) | (7 x 3) = 1221

11 x 19 = (1 x (1+1)) |  (1 x 9) = (1 x 2)  | (1 x 9) = 209

As you can see this method is corollary of  “Squaring number ending in 5”

It can also be extended to three digit numbers like :

E.g. 1: 292 x 208.

Here 92 + 08 = 100, L.H.S portion is same i.e. 2

292 x 208 = (2 x 3) x 10 | 92 x 8  (Note: if 3 digit numbers are multiplied, L.H.S has to be multiplied by 10)

60 | 736 (for 100 raise the L.H.S. product by 0) = 60736.

E.g. 2: 848 X 852

Here 48 + 52 = 100,

L.H.S portion is 8 and its next number is 9.

848 x 852 = 8 x 9 x 10 | 48 x 52 (Note: For 48 x 52, use methods shown above)

720 | 2496

= 722496.

[L.H.S product is to be multiplied by 10 and 2 to be carried over because the base is 100].

Eg. 3: 693 x 607

693 x 607 = 6 x 7 x 10 | 93 x 7 = 420 / 651 = 420651.

Note: This Vedic Maths method can also be used to multiply any two different numbers, but it requires several more steps and is sometimes no faster than any other method. Thus try to use it where it is most effective

How do you like this Vedic Maths technique, please let us know. You can also share this with your friends. #### Vineet Patawari

Hi, I'm Vineet Patawari. I fell in love with numbers after being scared of them for quite some time. Now, I'm here to make you feel comfortable with numbers and help you get rid of Math Phobia!

## 15 thoughts to “Multiply 2 numbers, sum of whose unit places is 10”

1. Motu says:

666
666pls multiplication this problem wit easiest method and describe whole method here

2. Motu says:

666
666pls multiplication this problem wit easiest method and describe whole method here

3. sanjay kumar says:

great sir, but how we will be able to remember all these steps.

1. Preeti Patawari says:

Practice 🙂 with lots of practice you will know them like the back of your hand!

4. Vishal says:

how to multiplty 48 x 52 by above method ?? please reply .

1. Jewel Debnath says:

48*(42+10)=2016+480=2496

5. neerja says:

sir,
thank you for this awesome trick but in eg 2 you have given a note that use the above trick to multiply 48 and 52 which is not possible through above give method
then what to do.

6. himanshu says:

sir,
thank you for this awesome trick but in eg 2 you have given a note that use the above trick to multiply 48 and 52 which is not possible through above give method

7. santosh says:

sir, I would like to know whether there is any alternative method for subtraction, other then conventional one as the mathematical operation is elemantory one. I have got one alternative method which is more easy, works batter with larger numerals.

8. NABIN ADHIKARI says:

How can i multiplied this in short formula = 6666*666*66*6 = ?

1. NABIN ADHIKARI says:

kindly inform.

9. deepika says:

sir is trick se aur koi ans nai aa raha maine jab 56×57 me applicable karna chaha to nai hua ans 3042 aa raha but right ans 3192 hai ……….help

1. deepika says:

sorry sir i m posting this comment on another site so plz ignore my previous comment i m very sorry………………….and your trick is really helpful.

2. inzi says:

ye trick tabhi kaam karti h jab last digit ka sum 10 ho…. 56*57 me last digit ka sum 6+7=13 ho rha h …. esliye ye trick kaam nhi kar rhi h